judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4414
A-4414
12/04/1953
Application for Writ of Error
GEORGE MCLENDON
CITY OF HOUSTON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/24/1954Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
04/01/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/17/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/14/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
12/04/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/24/1954Brief in Support of Petition
04/01/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/17/1954Opinion issued
02/17/1954Supplemental Brief filed
01/13/1954Document received (See Remarks)
01/13/1954Document received (See Remarks)
12/14/1953Response to Petition
12/04/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/04/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
George McLendonPetitioner
City of HoustonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information