Case Information: 01-CF-1544 | |||
Short Caption: | RICHARD J. SHIVERS, IV V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F3329-01 | Filed Date: | 12/07/2001 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/07/2001 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/14/2002 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/01/2002 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/25/2003 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/22/2003 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Richard J. Shivers, IV | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/07/2001 | NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by: Leonard Long 202 467-5664 385311 | |||
01/10/2002 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Carey Woll, Esquire | |||
01/30/2002 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS no oppo | |||
01/30/2002 | RECEIVED - aplt's docketing statement | |||
02/04/2002 | On consideration of the motion of appellant for leave to file the lodged docketing statement, and no opposition having been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant is granted, and the lodged docketing statement is filed. (GP) | |||
02/04/2002 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT | |||
02/04/2002 | error | |||
02/14/2002 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
02/28/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 1 (7 pgs--Kaczorowski) 9/18/01 proc. | |||
03/25/2002 | COURT REPORTER MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings September 10-14, 2001 until May 23, 2001. (Court Reporter Pilgrim) | |||
03/27/2002 | ORDERED: that the motion is granted, and the Court reporter is directed to file, without further extension, the aforesaid transcript on or before May 23, 2002. (proceedings September 10-14) | |||
04/04/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (20pgs/Pirfo) 11/9/01 proc. | |||
05/01/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (111pgs/Ronan) 9/17/01 proc. | |||
06/14/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 4 (pp210-616--Pilgrim) 9/13-14/01 proc. | |||
06/14/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 5 (209 pgs--Pilgrim) 9/10,12/01 proc. | |||
06/14/2002 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
07/19/2002 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief_ of appellant_ shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief_ of appellee_ shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP) | |||
08/26/2002 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 10/2/02. no oppo | |||
08/30/2002 | On consideration of the motion of appellant_ for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and no opposition having been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before October 2, 2002. (GP) | |||
10/02/2002 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
11/01/2002 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
11/01/2002 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
11/01/2002 | APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo | |||
11/15/2002 | On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellee to supplement the record with the lodged Government Exhibit R-2, that was part of the record in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the lodged document is forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. (GP) | |||
11/20/2002 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
11/22/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (gov't exhibit R-2 hospital records of Kenneth Dodd Tabs 1-21) | |||
02/03/2003 | CALENDAR NOTICE SENT | |||
02/27/2003 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#7 - Superior Court Docket entries - 2 pgs. | |||
03/25/2003 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/25/2003 | SUBMITTED (SC,GL,FE) | |||
03/27/2003 | AFFIRMED moj (SC,GL,FE) | |||
04/11/2003 | CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER | |||
04/22/2003 | MANDATE ISSUED |