judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4719
A-4719
06/02/1954
Application for Writ of Error
E-Z FINANCE COMPANY, ET AL., PAUL R. LUTHER AND MRS. A. B. LUTHER
E. ROY WRIGHT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/09/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/09/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/12/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
06/04/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/04/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/14/1954Response to Motion filed
12/09/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/09/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/12/1954Response to Petition
06/04/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/04/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/04/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/02/1954Letter Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E. Roy WrightRespondent
E-Z Finance Company, et al.Petitioner
Paul R. Luther and Mrs. A. B. LutherPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information