judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN ARTHUR TAYLOR, JR. v. CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, KEITH NACHBAR, ROBERT HAND, WILL CHAMBERS, JIMMY BRIERLY, CHARLES CHAPIN, agents for CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION

Case Heading (S-09-0074)
Case Number:S-09-0074Case Docketed On:04/09/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:City of CasperCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:JOHN ARTHUR TAYLOR, JR. v. CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, KEITH NACHBAR, ROBERT HAND, WILL CHAMBERS, JIMMY BRIERLY, CHARLES CHAPIN, agents for CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION
Full Title:JOHN ARTHUR TAYLOR, JR., Petitioner, v. CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, KEITH NACHBAR, ROBERT HAND, WILL CHAMBERS, JIMMY BRIERLY, CHARLES CHAPIN, agents for CITY OF CASPER, A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerJohn Arthur Taylor Jr. Pro Se
RespondentCity of CasperP. Craig Silva
RespondentKeith Robert NachbarP. Craig Silva
RespondentRobert Jerry HandP. Craig Silva
RespondentWilliam R. ChambersP. Craig Silva
RespondentJimmy BrierlyP. Craig Silva
RespondentCharles S. ChapinP. Craig Silva
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/09/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/09/2009Petition - Writ - review - Styled "Motion for Expedited Stay of Mandate Notice of Continuing Perjury by Brierly" and copy of cdPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
04/09/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/20/2009Correspondence - Incoming from Petitioner, copy to Senior Staff AttorneyCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
04/23/2009Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
04/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petitioners' Motion for Expedited Stay of Mandate, Notice of Continuing Perjury by Brierly and Special Appeal in Respect to Collusion, Conspiracy and PerjuryEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2009Order - Denying Special Appeal and Order Denying Motion for Expedited Stay of MandateOrderDenyFinal
04/28/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/29/2009Event - Rejected Filing of "Brief of the Case" with attachments. Returned documents with letter advising case is closed.EventRejected FilingFinal
05/12/2009Event - Rejected Filing - returned documents, including "Land Patent Brief" with letter informing appellant again that this case is closed.EventRejected FilingFinal