judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY BUSH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1609
Short Caption:ANTHONY BUSH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-16628-10Filed Date:12/23/2010

Opening Event Date:12/23/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Bush Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/05/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER of the Superior Court... (BY: ETW)
01/05/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
01/19/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's pro se).
02/03/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as PREMATURELY FILED but W/O PREJUDICE to appellant filing a timely NOA after he has been sentenced. (BRTEFA) (rm)
02/03/2011DISMISSED
02/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED