judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00195-CR
03-94-00195-CR
04/18/1994
Other misdemeanors
Ronald Jackson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/19/1998CASE STORED
07/25/1996Mandate Issued
07/25/1996Mandate Issued
04/03/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/08/1995Submitted
12/08/1995Submission
12/07/1995Oral argument acknowledged
10/27/1995Submission
04/17/1995Case ready to be set
04/17/1995Brief filed
03/22/1995Brief filed
03/22/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/17/1995Brief received, not filed
03/17/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/23/1995Letter received
02/21/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/15/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/24/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/17/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/28/1994Exhibits filed
11/28/1994Statement of Facts Filed
09/26/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/22/1994Judgment withdrawn
06/22/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1994Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1994Opinion Withdrawn
06/22/1994Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
06/22/1994Motion for Rehearing Granted
06/10/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
06/03/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/25/1994Order Entered
05/13/1994Motion for rehearing filed
05/04/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
04/29/1994Letter received
04/18/1994Transcript Filed
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/04/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Jackson, RonaldAppellantMr. John Fahle
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Mark B. Taylor
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Hays
Honorable Linda Rodriguez
37,369
$750 fine