judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00638-CV
05-94-00638-CV
04/18/1994
Workers Compensation
Sakouhi, JeanMichel
Texas Employment Commision & Rosewood Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/13/2015Letter issued by the court
06/26/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
05/10/1995Case stored
05/10/1995Mandate Issued
05/10/1995Mandate Issued
04/29/1995Mandate due to be issued
02/28/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/28/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/13/1994Submission
12/13/1994Submitted
12/13/1994Submission
12/13/1994Submitted
11/03/1994MattConv
07/08/1994Brief Filed
07/08/1994Case ready to be set
07/08/1994Case ready to be set
06/30/1994Letter Filed
06/16/1994Brief Filed
06/14/1994Collection letter on Filing Fee
05/13/1994Transcript Filed
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/13/1994Appeal Bond Filed
03/18/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/10/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Ted M. Akin
93-3749-G