judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00366-CV
01-94-00366-CV
04/18/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Bhalli, Sherry B.
The Methodist Hospital, Larry Mathis, Phil Robinson, et al
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/25/1996Mandate issued
02/12/1996Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/11/1995Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
08/07/1995Motion to file writ
07/21/1995Writ Due
07/21/1995Writ filed
07/11/1995Extension to file writ disposedGrant motion
07/06/1995Motion to file writ
06/21/1995Motion to file writ
05/23/1995Extension to file writ disposedGrant motion
05/20/1995Writ Due
05/19/1995Motion to file writ
05/08/1995Date final opinion release for publication
04/20/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/10/1995Motion for rehearing filed
04/08/1995Motion for Rehearing Due
03/09/1995Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
03/06/1995Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
02/27/1995Motion for Rehearing Due
02/02/1995Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
01/27/1995Appellate filing fee due or appeal may be dismissed
01/27/1995Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
01/12/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/06/1994Submitted
12/06/1994Submission
12/06/1994Submitted
10/27/1994Submission
09/09/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/09/1994Case ready to be set
09/09/1994Case ready to be set
09/01/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/17/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/25/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/18/1994Supplemental transcript filed
06/30/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
06/27/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
06/17/1994Motion for leave to file strans
06/17/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/02/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/26/1994Motion to substitute counselGrant motion
05/19/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/13/1994Motion to substitute counsel
04/18/1994Transcript filed
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/24/1994Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeDouglas E. Hamel
StateAppelleePaul E. Stallings
StateAppellantErik Sunde
StateAppelleeRobert L. Ivey
StateAppellantGregg M. Rosenberg
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
92-36546