judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00137-CR
02-94-00137-CR
04/18/1994
Robbery
Holiday, Jr., Elmer Otto
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/16/1995Mandate Issued
06/29/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1995Submitted
05/23/1995Submission
05/03/1995Submission
04/10/1995Brief Filed
04/10/1995Case ready to be set
04/10/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/18/1994Brief Filed
06/27/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
06/27/1994Submission
04/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/16/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Holiday, Jr., Elmer OttoCriminal - AppellantRobert Ford
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Leo Everett Young
0513276D
28 yrs IDTDCJ