judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0417-94
PD-0417-94
04/19/1994
PDR Case Type
DUNN, WENDELL VERNALD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/20/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1994FINAL DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/20/1994RESPONSE FILED
04/19/1994PDR FILED
04/19/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DUNN, WENDELL VERNALDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Philip C. Banks
STATE OF TEXASStateWilliam R. Turner
Court of Appeals Information:
01-93-00855-CR
AFF 3-10-94
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
361st District Court
Brazos
Honorable CAROLYN L. RUFFINO
22,075-361