judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0419-94
PD-0419-94
04/19/1994
PDR Case Type
CROSBY, ANTHONY RAY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/23/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/19/1994PDR FILED
04/19/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
CROSBY, ANTHONY RAYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Hal E. Turley
Court of Appeals Information:
05-92-02855-CR
AFF 2-28-94
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
204th District Court
Dallas
Honorable RICHARD MAYS
F92-36131-LQ