judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00139-CR
02-94-00139-CR
04/18/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Smith, Kenneth Reed
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/27/1995Mandate Issued
10/25/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
08/23/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/10/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/26/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
06/29/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/26/1995Submitted
04/26/1995Submission
04/21/1995Letter
02/24/1995Brief Filed
02/24/1995Case ready to be set
10/03/1994Brief Filed
05/05/1994No Description Available.
05/05/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/05/1994Submission
05/04/1994No Description Available.
05/02/1994No Description Available.
04/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/27/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Smith, Kenneth ReedCriminal - AppellantWilliam H. "Bill" Ray
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
0362526D
LIFE, IDTDCJ/$10,000 FINE