judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: LARRY MICHAEL JOHNSON, Deceased. KELLIANN JOHNSON v. LARRY M. JOHNSON

Case Heading (S-09-0040)
Case Number:S-09-0040Case Docketed On:03/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: LARRY MICHAEL JOHNSON, Deceased. KELLIANN JOHNSON v. LARRY M. JOHNSON
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: LARRY MICHAEL JOHNSON, Deceased. KELLIANN JOHNSON, Appellant (Respondent), v. LARRY M. JOHNSON, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKelliann JohnsonMatthew August Bartlett
AppelleeLarry M. JohnsonV. Anthony Vehar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates
Opinion Number:2010 WY 63
Citation:231 P.3d 873

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/20/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant. Counsel fail to send sufficient number of briefs, called and requested another copy.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2009Brief - Other - Additional copy of brief requested from counsel for Appellant. (Brief put into mail six days after request)BriefOtherFinal
06/08/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/26/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant (Untimely, received two days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/06/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/18/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court, Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinion in which Justice Golden joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/07/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/4/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal