judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUBE' VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36354
Short Caption:DUBE' VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0000246Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Certiorari
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/27/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Paul Gabriel Yohey--check no. 10466.
06/27/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11032
06/30/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Respondent's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and Motion to have Notice of Appeal and this Motion treated as Petition for Application for an Extraordinary Writ. 00-11221
07/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, we grant Dube's alternative request, and we elect to treat this matter as a petition for a writ of certiorari. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall modify the caption on this court's docket consistent with the caption appearing on this order. Petitioner Dube' shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file an affidavit in support of the petition. Real party in interest Aspen Construction Company shall have 10 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including points and authorities, in response to Dube's petition. Finally, pending further order of this court and consideration of the real party in interest's answer, we hereby temporarily stay all proceedings below, including the transfer of funds which were "seized by the Washoe County Sheriff on June 12, 2000." 00-11268
07/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of Peter R. Dube'. 00-11464
07/12/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Aspen Construction's Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ (Certiorari). 00-11995
09/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Certiorari. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[In light of this order, we vacate the temporary stay granted on July 3, 2000. In the answer to the petition, the real party in interest requests sanctions against petitioner. We deny this request and remind counsel that the proper vehicle for seeking such relief is by formal motion.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-15709
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-15782
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.