judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DR. JOE GILBERT, ET UX. v. H. F. GREEN

Case: A-3176
A-3176
05/03/1951
Application for Writ of Error
DR. JOE GILBERT, ET UX.
H. F. GREEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/10/1951Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/10/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
05/03/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1951Response to Motion filed
10/18/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/03/1951Opinion issued
06/06/1951Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1951Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1951Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1951Supplemental Brief filed
05/10/1951Response to Petition
05/03/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/03/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. Joe Gilbert, et ux.Petitioner
H. F. GreenRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information