judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-7317
B-7317
01/19/1978
Application for Writ of Error
BARNETT WADE GARRISON
TEXAS COMMERCE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, TEMPORARY ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CANDACE MOSSLER, DECEASED, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/03/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/21/1978Reply to ResponseRespondent
02/10/1978Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/19/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/19/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/15/1978Response to Motion filed
05/03/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/21/1978Reply to Response
02/10/1978Response to Petition
01/19/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/19/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/19/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Commerce Bank National Association, Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Candace Mossler, deceased, et al.Respondent
Barnett Wade GarrisonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information