judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-7340
B-7340
01/25/1978
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
NANCY KAY (SMITH) TRADER
HON. JAMES F. DEAN, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/22/1978Post submission brief filedRespondent
02/22/1978Post submission brief filedRelator
02/01/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
02/01/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
02/01/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
01/30/1978Supplement to Petition filedRelator
01/30/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/26/1978Concurring Opinion issued.
04/26/1978Opinion issued
02/22/1978Post submission brief filed
02/22/1978Post submission brief filed
02/01/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/01/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/01/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
02/01/1978Miscellaneous Motion
01/30/1978Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
01/30/1978Supplement to Petition filed
01/30/1978Response to Petition
01/25/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nancy Kay (Smith) TraderRelator
Hon. James F. Dean, Jr.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information