judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICKY L. CANTY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1562
Short Caption:RICKY L. CANTY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-16321-10Filed Date:12/20/2010

Opening Event Date:12/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/13/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicky L. Canty Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL w/appendix (EMERGENCY)
12/20/2010TMC - EMERGENCY motion for summary affirmance - oppo
12/22/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's emergency motion for summary reversal of dention order
12/22/2010ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL (MORE)
12/22/2010F/ORDERED and ADJUDGED sua sponte that the order on appeal is hereby affirmed. (FIOBFA)
12/29/2010RECEIVED - Supplemental Record #1 (44 pgs/Tape - 9/3/10 proc.)
12/29/2010RECEIVED - Supplemental Record #2 - (24 pgs/Davis - 12/16/10 am proc. w/CD attached)
12/29/2010RECEIVED - Supplemental Record #3 (45 pgs/Pirfo - 12/16/10 pm proc.)
01/04/2011RECEIVED - Record & Rec Index
01/13/2011MANDATE ISSUED