judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. F. GRIMM, ET UX. v. SARAH MARGARET BECK, ET VIR

Case: A-3186
A-3186
05/09/1951
Application for Writ of Error
J. F. GRIMM, ET UX.
SARAH MARGARET BECK, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/05/1951Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
06/14/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/16/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
05/09/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/09/1951Letter Filed
07/05/1951Amended motion for rehearingOverruled
06/14/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/22/1951Motion to amend application for writ of errorOverruled
05/16/1951Response to Petition
05/09/1951Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/09/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sarah Margaret Beck, et virRespondent
J. F. Grimm, et ux.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information