judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARC A. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1551
Short Caption:MARC A. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-24049-09Filed Date:12/09/2010

Opening Event Date:12/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarc Wilson Y
Steven R. KiershYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Steven R. Kiersh, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Steven R. Kiersh, Esquire
02/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 27, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
02/14/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
02/14/2011RECEIVED - Statmenet re transcript.
02/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
02/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (232 pgs/Maar) 9/8-9/10 proc. w/cd
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011RECORD COPIES
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (SEALED pleading)
03/02/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/11/2011 APPELLANT'S BRIEF (pii)
03/11/2011APPENDIX (appellant) (pii)
04/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/18/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appendix
06/27/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE***
06/27/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (GLRDTE)
07/19/2011FiledMandate