judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PERRY (RALPH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36349
Short Caption:PERRY (RALPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157427BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-10890
06/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/19/99, 8/9/99, 8/30/99, 9/9/99, 4/18/00 and 5/23/00. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. Filed in district court on: June 22, 2000. 00-10891
07/20/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/19/99, 8/9/99, 8/30/99, 9/9/99, 4/18/00, 5/23/99. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 00-12528
07/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-13095
08/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served on or before August 31, 2000. 00-13832
09/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Cousnel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-16868
09/26/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-16976
09/26/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-16977
09/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-16978
10/06/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix were filed on September 26, 2000. Accordingly, we deny as moot appellant's motion seeking an extension of time to file a fast track statement. 00-17715
10/12/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-18100
10/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-18102
02/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03227
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03366
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03366