judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROGER LEE SNOW v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0031)
Case Number:S-11-0031Case Docketed On:01/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:ROGER LEE SNOW v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ROGER LEE SNOW, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoger Lee SnowGregory J. Blenkinsop
Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Joshua Beau Taylor
Bret Engstrom
Stewart Michael Young
Gregory A. Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2012 WY 18
Citation:270 P.3d 656

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/14/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/15/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance from Gregory J. Blenkinsop and Elisabeth Trefonas to appear on behalf of Appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/13/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
04/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/15/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel for AppellantOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
04/27/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/16/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/29/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Received confidential folder (Volume III) of record from the AG's office by hand delivery. This was mailed by Ms. Trefonas to the AG's office instead of to Clerk of District Court. Clerk has already mailed the record to us, will hold for filing with rest of record.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/26/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Elizabeth Trefonas for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bret Engstrom for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Bret Engstrom, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Engstrom for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/09/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/27/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/02/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/1/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal