judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VILLANUEVA (MAYNOR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36348
Short Caption:VILLANUEVA (MAYNOR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 66640 , 66640-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C163182Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/01/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-10887
07/11/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-11849
07/13/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Appellant Maynor David Villanuevea intends to challenge the constitutionality of NRS 193.161. (No action required; letter was served on Attorney General who represents respondent -- See NRAP 44. AH) 00-12135
08/02/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/10/00, 3/13/00, 6/7/00. Court Reporter: Robert Mintun. 00-13361
10/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date, appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request in compliance with NRAP 9(a). On August 2, 2000, court recorder Robert Mintun filed certified copies of transcripts of proceedings conducted in the action below on February 10, 2000, March 13, 2000, and June 7, 2000. In the event no additional transcripts are necessary for this court's review of this appeal, appellant shall so inform this court in writing within 10 days of the date of this order. In the event appellant intends to rely on additional transcripts, he shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve a transcript request form. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for appellant. 00-18454
10/25/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 11/24/00. 00-18858
10/30/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Counsel's Response to the Order to Show Cause. 00-19107
11/28/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 11/27/00. 00-20690
11/28/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (Record on Appeal, Pages 1-91). 00-20691
01/03/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-00120
01/03/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Pre-Sentence Investigation Report-SEALED. 01-00121
01/29/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 01/26/01. 01-01919
05/01/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-07268
05/01/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP01A-MS/DA/RR.
05/29/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Robert M. Draskovich). 01-08995
07/25/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Shearing, Agosti and Rose, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. NNP01A 01-12583
08/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13022
08/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/30/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2001. 01-13022