judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKERS' COMPENSATION CLAIM OF JAMES ELDER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION and WAL-MART STORES, INC.

Case Heading (S-11-0030)
Case Number:S-11-0030Case Docketed On:01/28/2011
Linked To: S-11-0029
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKERS' COMPENSATION CLAIM OF JAMES ELDER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION and WAL-MART STORES, INC.
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKERS' COMPENSATION CLAIM OF JAMES ELDER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION and WAL-MART STORES, INC., Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames ElderRobert A. Nicholas
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionJohn William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Michael J. Finn
Gregory A. Phillips
AppelleeWal-Mart Stores, Inc.John A. Sundahl

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 148
Citation:262 P.3d 1263

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/27/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/27/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/27/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
02/08/2011Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
03/18/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/21/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/18/2011Brief - Appellant (Called counsel, link checkbox did not attach e-filing, only posting. Will resubmit in this docket number.)BriefAppellantFinal
04/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2011Brief - Appellee Wyoming Workers' Safety & Compensation DivisionBriefAppelleeFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2011Brief - Appellee Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellee Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Employer)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/08/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/24/2011Brief - Appellant reply. Electronic version of brief filed in S-11-0029BriefAppellant replyFinal
06/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/27/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/05/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume 1, Original Papers; Volume 2, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/28/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/16/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/16/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/23/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/21/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal