judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEROY J. JENKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1550
Short Caption:LEROY J. JENKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-22113-07Filed Date:12/09/2010

Opening Event Date:12/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:05/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/07/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/26/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeroy J. Jenkins Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Angela G. Schmidt YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/25/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (112 pgs/Hawkins) 10/3/07 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (38 pgs/Hawkins) 6/29/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (37 pgs/Davis) 7/06/09 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (21 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 7/22/09 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (74 pgs/Swaringer) 4/19/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (80 pgs/Swaringer) 4/21/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (21 pgs/Swaringer) 4/22/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (31 pgs/Johnson) 6/11/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (216 pgs/Zamora) 9/8/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (158 pgs/Zamora) 9/09/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (171 pgs/Zamora) 9/13/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (166 pgs/Zamora) 9/14/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (181 pgs/Zamora) 9/15/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (99 pgs/Zamora) 9/16/10 proc.
03/07/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (153 pgs/Wood) 9/20/10 proc. (Excerpt) (Corrected page 72 inserted from CCRD on 2/7/12) TJL
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (143 pgs/Wood) 9/21/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (23 pgs/Wood) 9/22/10 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (24 pgs/tape) 12/1/10 proc. w/cd
03/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/15/2011RECORD INDEX
03/15/2011RECORD COPIES
03/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #19 (SEALED pleadings)
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. (JAC)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for extenson to 10/24/11.
08/09/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (4 pgs/Davis) 7/6/09 proc. w/cd
09/09/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledORDER SUA SPONTE - Withdraw Appointed Counsel James W. Klein, Esquire, and appointing Christine Pembroke, Esquire.
09/23/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/28/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
12/13/2011FiledMotion to expedite the waiver of the page limit for aplt's brief. (Appellant)Denied
12/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/29/2011FiledTMC//MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS//MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE BRIEF
01/09/2012FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO WAIVE THE PAGE LIMITATION FOR HIS INITIAL BRIEF and GRANTING APPELANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and the BRIEF SHALL BE FILED BY FEBRUARY 3, 2012
01/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (3 pgs/Swaringer) 4/19/10 proc
01/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #22 (38 pgs/Zamora) 9/7/10 proc.
01/19/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #23 (40 pgs/tape) 9/7/10 proc. w/cd
02/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
03/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/08/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
05/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/10/12
05/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/10/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
05/11/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee
06/01/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #24 (documents filed in Superior Court)
06/04/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/04/2012FiledMotion to compel disclosure of misconduct before the Grand Jury (Appellant)Referred
06/07/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's motion to compel disclosure of alleged mis-conduct. (Appellee)
06/25/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/27/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte that Motion to compel disclosure of misconduct before the Grand Jury (Appellant) and Opposition to appellant's motion to compel disclosure of alleged mis-conduct. (Appellee) are hereby held in abeyance and referred to the merits panel upon assignment.
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/17/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #25 (19 pgs/Ronan) 4/5/10 proc. w/cd
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/02/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
01/07/2013FiledArgued Before Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Steadman, Christine Pembroke Esq.,for appellant, Angela G.Schmidt Esq.,for appellee.
02/22/2013FiledNotice Received from counsel for appellant regarding issuance of a collateral attack was filed in Superior Court (see attached) (Appellant)
06/26/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
07/08/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
07/10/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
08/27/2013FiledMotion for appellant's release pending appeal and for appointment of counsel (Appellant)Denied as Moot
09/10/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc.
09/12/2013FiledOrder Denying as moot aplt's motion for release.
11/26/2013FiledMandate