judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MANKE VS. AIRPORT AUTHORITY

Case Information: 36369
Short Caption:MANKE VS. AIRPORT AUTHORITYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9905413Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/10/2000 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/17/2001 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/17/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Steven F. Bus Ltd.--check no. 5669.
07/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11266
07/10/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/16/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-18331
10/16/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/25/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-18832
10/30/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-19055
11/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 00-19412
11/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-19415
11/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 8th and 18th, 2000. To Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 00-19850
12/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. As appellants' notice of appeal appears timely filed, we deny respondent's motion to dismiss the appeal. 00-21192
01/10/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 8, 2000. Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 01-00580
02/22/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 02/22/01. 01-03409
02/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-03414
03/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To datge, court reporter Davidson has not filed a certified copy of the requested transcript for proceedings conducted on May 18, 2000. On February 22, 2001, appellant filed an opening brief and an appendix which contains a copy of the transcript of the May 18, 2000, proceedings, but does not contain the file-stamp of the district court clerk. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we decline to strike the appendix. Because all transcripts necessary for consideration of this appeal appear to have been filed, court reporter Davidson shall not be required to file a certified copy of the transcript of proceedings held on May 18, 2000. 01-04450
03/26/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 5, 2001. 01-05274
04/06/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 04/06/01 (Reno/Carson). 01-05933
04/06/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-05935
04/26/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 17, 2001. 01-07055
05/17/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/17/01. 01-08276
05/17/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
08/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on October 17, 2001, at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc)
10/01/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/17/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. En Banc
11/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC/FULL COURT 01-18561
11/13/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Order (Order of Affirmance on 11/07/01). 01-18854
11/16/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs. 01-19262
11/16/2001Other Other. Filed Verified Bill of Costs. 01-19263
11/20/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend the Filing Time for Appellants' Response in Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. 01-19453
11/26/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Steven F. Bus-check no. 6277.
11/26/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: Hand Delivered. 01-19724
12/13/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)),
03/21/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. On November 20, 2001, the parties filed a "Stipulation to Extend the Filing Time for Appellants' Response in Opposition to Respondent's Motion for attorney Fees and Costs." In that stipulation, the parties indicate that they agree that, "pursuant to NRAP 31(a)(1)," appellants may have an additional 10 days to file their opposition to respondent's motion and bill of costs. fn1[We remind the parties that the provisions of NRAP 31(a)(1) concerning extensions of time apply only to the filing of briefs.] Cause appearing, we approve the stipulation. The clerk of this court shall file appellants' opposition that was received on December 6, 2001. We defer ruling on respondent's motion or the verified bill of costs pending resolution of the petition for rehearing that was filed on November 26, 2001. 02-05045
03/21/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs. 01-20507
04/09/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Order Denying Rehearing and Correcting Order of Affirmance. "We conclude that rehearing is not warranted." We direct the clerk of this court to correct the Order of Affirmance by deleting the second full paragraph on page three of that order. We deny respondent's motion for attorney's fees and excess costs. The clerk of this court shall allow respondent costs in the amount of $245.96 in accordance with the verified bill of costs filed November 16, 2001. En Banc. 02-06292
04/24/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-06510
04/24/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/02/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 29, 2002. 02-06510
08/19/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Michael G. Chapman - updated address. 02-14088