judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BALYNDA KAY FOSTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0056)
Case Number:S-09-0056Case Docketed On:03/25/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:BALYNDA KAY FOSTER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BALYNDA KAY FOSTER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBalynda Kay FosterDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 8
Citation:224 P.3d 1

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/25/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/06/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/26/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/26/2009Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
06/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Appellant, Errata SheetEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/04/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Confidential Folder; Volume V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/16/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal, Exhibits 1 & 2, inadvertently left out of fileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/16/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/18/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/17/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal