Case Information: 02-CF-0849 | |||
Short Caption: | LEON A. SAVOY V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F8020-01 | Filed Date: | 07/08/2002 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/08/2002 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 12/10/2002 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/04/2003 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/05/2004 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/29/2004 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Leon A. Savoy | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/08/2002 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/13/2002 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Steven M. Stomski, Esquire | |||
08/22/2002 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (rt ordered) | |||
09/11/2002 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
10/24/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (131pgs/Watson) 6/14/02 proc. | |||
12/10/2002 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD # 2 (138 pgs--taped) 6/17/02 proc. | |||
12/10/2002 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
06/04/2003 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief_ of appellant_ shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief_ of appellee_ shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP) | |||
07/14/2003 | COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) | Denied | ||
07/24/2003 | In the Above case, your court-appointed counsel has filed a motion to withdraw from this appeal. If you wish, you may file a response to your attorney's motion by the date set forth in the attached order. In your response, you should set out your reasons why your attorney should not be permitted to withdraw. You may also set forth any grounds for appeal you believe you may have. In the event you need additional time within which to respond, you must advise the court in writing using the self addressed stamped envelope provided. After your response has been received or the time for filing has expired, the motion and any response you may make will be submitted to the court for its consideration. The court will also review the record of the trial proceedings including the court reporter's transcript. If the court concludes the appeal lacks merit and grants the motion of your court-appointed counsel to withdraw, the appeal may be dismissed. Therefore, it is important that you file a response to the motion if your believe there are grounds for appeal. (By: GP) | |||
07/24/2003 | ORDER: Appellant shall file by August 25, 2003, any response showing cause why counsel's motion should not be granted, the appeal dismissed, and the judgment from which the appeal was taken affirmed. Failure to respond shall result in the motion being submitted for decision on the motion and record alone. F/O that the motion of court-appointed counsel to withdraw is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (by: WAGNER) | |||
08/26/2003 | TMC - Motion to withdraw as counsel (ANDERS) | |||
09/03/2003 | ORDER DENY COUNSEL MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) and counsel is hereby directed to file a brief within 30 days from the date of this order which addresses, at a minimum, the sufficiency of the evidence to support both of appellant's convictions. F/O that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (by: FAPYNE) | |||
10/03/2003 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
11/04/2003 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
11/04/2003 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
11/20/2003 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
12/10/2003 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (docket entries) | |||
03/05/2004 | CALENDAR NOTICE SENT | |||
04/05/2004 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/05/2004 | SUBMITTED (FA,RD,FE) | |||
04/07/2004 | AFFIRMED moj (FA,RD,FE) | |||
04/29/2004 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
05/12/2004 | CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER |