judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNN THOMAS WOYAK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0055)
Case Number:S-09-0055Case Docketed On:03/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JOHNN THOMAS WOYAK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHNN THOMAS WOYAK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohnn Thomas WoyakDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 27
Citation:226 P.3d 841

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/11/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/12/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/16/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/11/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for apellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/16/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the Court, Justice Burke filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 3/17/10 by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/01/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/01/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/05/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
04/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for (undated) by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal