judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CELESTE FOREMAN V. METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT

Case Information: 10-AA-1575
Short Caption:CELESTE FOREMAN V. METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/22/2010

Opening Event Date:12/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCeleste Foreman YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Metropolitan Police DepartmentN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/22/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW - NUNC PRO TUNC
12/22/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
01/05/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the LODGED PFR, NPT to December 22, 2010. It is *****MORE*****
01/05/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction since the decision attached to the petition does not appear to be from a contested case. See DC Code 2-510 (2001). (BY: ETW)
01/05/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
01/25/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 1/5/11
02/10/2011 ORDERED that the PFR IS DISMISSED for lack jurisdiction as this court has jurisdiction to her only contested case agency appeals...SEE HARDCOPY ****MORE*****
02/10/2011DISMISSED
03/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED