judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4394
A-4394
11/09/1953
Application for Writ of Error
D. W. HICKS
KENNETH C. MATTHEWS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/20/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
12/03/1953Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/25/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
11/09/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/1954Opinion issued
01/20/1954Brief on the Merits
12/03/1953Reply to Response
11/25/1953Response to Petition
11/09/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/09/1953Document received (See Remarks)
11/09/1953Document received (See Remarks)
11/09/1953Document received (See Remarks)
11/09/1953Document received (See Remarks)
11/09/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D. W. HicksPetitioner
Kenneth C. MatthewsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information