judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4346
A-4346
08/14/1953
Application for Writ of Error
W. E. KELLY
EDA TENKHOFF WOMACK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/11/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/19/1953Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
09/14/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
08/14/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/23/1954Response to Motion filed
06/09/1954Opinion issued
01/11/1954Supplemental Brief filed
12/19/1953Supplemental Brief filed
10/28/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/28/1953Document received (See Remarks)
09/14/1953Response to Petition
08/14/1953Additional Copies received
08/14/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/14/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eda Tenkhoff Womack, et al.Respondent
W. E. KellyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information