judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4358
A-4358
08/24/1953
Application for Writ of Error
U. C. BOYLES
ARCH V. GRESHAM IN RE: ESTATE OF LON GRESHAM, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/26/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/02/1953Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
09/29/1953Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/04/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
08/24/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/04/1954Response to Motion filed
01/26/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/13/1954Opinion issued
12/02/1953Supplemental Brief filed
10/07/1953Document received (See Remarks)
09/29/1953Reply to Response
09/04/1953Response to Petition
08/24/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/24/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Arch V. Gresham in re: Estate of Lon Gresham, deceasedRespondent
U. C. BoylesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information