judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4366
A-4366
09/28/1953
Application for Writ of Error
ROEGELEIN PROVISION COMPANY
MISSOURI-KANSAS-TEXAS RAILROAD COMPANY OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/16/1953Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/04/1953Response to Brief filedPetitioner
10/31/1953Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/17/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
09/28/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/21/1953Response to Motion filed
11/16/1953Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/04/1953Response to Brief filed
10/31/1953Supplemental Brief filed
10/17/1953Response to Petition
09/28/1953Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/28/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roegelein Provision CompanyPetitioner
Missouri-Kansas-Texas Railroad Company of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information