judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0261-94
PD-0261-94
03/10/1994
PDR Case Type
SKEETERS, GEORGIA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/02/1994FINAL DISPRefused
05/18/1994PDR DISPDismissed
05/18/1994PDR DISPDismissed
04/25/1994WITHDRAW PDR FILED
03/10/1994PDR FILED
03/10/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTimothy James
SKEETERS, GEORGIAApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Paul Tatum
Court of Appeals Information:
12-93-00217-CR
DISM WOJ 11-30-93
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
145th District Court
Nacogdoches
Honorable JACK PIERCE
2085-85-12