Case: 13-94-00125-CV
13-94-00125-CV
03/10/1994
Mandamus
Birdo, Burnice Joe
Littlejohn, Hon. Rachel, Judge of the 156th District Court of Bee County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/26/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
05/26/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Dismissed | |
05/26/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/26/1994 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/26/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/26/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Dismissed | |
05/26/1994 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | Dismissed | |
05/13/1994 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
05/09/1994 | Affidavit Filed | | |
05/05/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/04/1994 | Additional Copies of Affidavit | | |
05/04/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
05/04/1994 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
05/04/1994 | Motion to Substitute Counsel | | |
05/03/1994 | Affidavit Filed | | |
04/08/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
04/01/1994 | Copy of Letter | | |
03/28/1994 | Letter filed | | |
03/10/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
03/10/1994 | Motion for Leave to File Writ of Mandamus | | |
03/10/1994 | Writ (General) RECEIVED | | |
03/10/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/26/1994 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Littlejohn, Rachel | Respondent | Hon. Rachel Littlejohn |
Birdo, Burnice Joe | Relator | Burnice Joe Birdo |
Littlejohn, Rachel | Respondent | Jorge Vega Drew T. Durham Ann Kraatz Kathleen Ramirez Dan Morales |
Trial Court Information
156th District Court
Bee
Honorable Rachel Littlejohn
B-93-1288-9-CV-B