judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00126-CV
13-94-00126-CV
03/10/1994
Miscellaneous civil
H.E.Butt Grocery Company
Chrystal Currier
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/29/1994Cite for opinions
06/21/1994Mandate Issued
04/28/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/28/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/28/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/28/1994Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
04/18/1994Supplemental transcript recieved
04/15/1994Additional copies of motion for extension of time
04/15/1994Sworn Statement filed
04/11/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/11/1994Letter sent
04/11/1994Motion to supplement transcript
04/11/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/11/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/05/1994Green card in
03/31/199410 day letter sent
03/29/1994After Checked Out - Trans. Returned
03/29/1994Supplemental transcript recieved
03/24/1994Green card in
03/22/1994Statement Filed
03/21/199410 day letter sent
03/17/1994Transcript Received
03/14/1994Page filed
03/11/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
03/11/1994Statement of Facts Received
03/10/1994Filing Fee Paid
03/10/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
03/10/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/21/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H.e.butt Grocery CompanyAppellantMark Whitworth
Hon. Crisanta E. Guerra - Lozano
Chrystal CurrierAppelleeJohn Haywood
Trial Court Information
197th District Court
Willacy
Honorable Rogelio Valdez
92-233