judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0227
94-0227
03/10/1994
See former TRAP 130(D)
ELAINE HOUSE
HECTOR HOUSE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/20/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/19/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApp denied
05/05/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/20/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/11/1994APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDin the Court of Appeals on or before the 31st of March, 1994.
03/11/1994Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 03-31-94
03/10/1994Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/19/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HOUSE, HECTORRespondentMs. Sheryll S. Dempsey
HOUSE, ELAINEPetitionerMr. James M. Whitten
Ms. Anita O'Rourke
Court of Appeals Information:
13-92-00496-CV
Aff'd/Vacated/Rev & Remd
RULE 90, 12-09-93
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable NOAH KENNEDY
Trial Court Information
343rd District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Alonzo T. Rodriguez
27713-C