judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00127-CR
04-94-00127-CR
03/10/1994
State's Appeal of adverse ruling of trial court
Texas, The State of
Bartee, Jimmy
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2017Internal memo
04/17/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/13/1995Mandate Issued
04/13/1995Mandate Issued
02/15/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
12/30/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/30/1994Mot. EOT To File Supp Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/19/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
12/19/1994Supplemental Brief Received
12/19/1994Mot. EOT to File Supp Brief Filed
09/22/1994Submitted
09/22/1994Submission
09/22/1994Submitted
09/19/1994No New Event but Update in Calendar
08/04/1994Submission
06/24/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/16/1994Brief Filed
06/16/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
06/16/1994Motion Filed
06/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/1994Brief Filed
06/06/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
06/06/1994Case ready to be set
06/06/1994Motion for Leave Filed
06/06/1994Case ready to be set
05/19/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/28/1994Brief Filed
04/28/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
04/25/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/05/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/24/1994No Description Available.
03/18/1994No Description Available.
03/10/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1994Motion Filed
03/03/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/18/1994Order Entered
03/18/1984No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/13/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
06/22/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bartee, JimmyAppelleeBernard L. Campion
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasAngela J. Moore
Texas, The State OfCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Terrence W. Mcdonald
93-CR-7158-A