judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00133-CV
03-94-00133-CV
03/10/1994
Administrative law
City of Amarillo
Railroad Commission of Texas and Energas Company, a Division of Atmos Energy Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/01/1997CASE STORED
09/03/1996Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
08/22/1996Letter requesting pickup of exhibits
03/22/1996Mandate Issued
11/14/1995Case returned from higher court
10/05/1995Appl Writ to Supreme Court denied
05/15/1995Case forwarded to higher court
05/05/1995Petition for writ of mandamus
04/05/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/31/1995Letter received
03/29/1995Response to Motion
03/16/1995Motion for rehearing filed
03/07/1995Letter received
03/01/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/14/1994Submitted
12/14/1994Submission
11/07/1994Oral argument acknowledged
11/04/1994Oral argument acknowledged
11/03/1994Oral argument acknowledged
11/01/1994Submission
05/31/1994Brief filed
05/27/1994Case ready to be set
05/27/1994Brief filed
05/04/1994Brief with appendix filed
04/08/1994Exhibits filed
04/08/1994Attachments to transcript
04/08/1994Transcript & SF Filed
03/23/1994Exhibits received
03/23/1994Statement of Facts Received
03/15/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
03/10/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission Of TexasAppelleeMr. Douglas Fraser
The Honorable Dan Morales
City Of AmarilloAppellantThe Honorable Merrill Nunn
Mr. Steven A. Porter
Energas Company, A Division OfAppelleeMr. Lee Allen Everett
Mr. Tom D. Stephens
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable F. Scott McCown
93-01609