judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDREW HINES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1573
Short Caption:ANDREW HINES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL7060-05Filed Date:12/21/2010

Opening Event Date:12/21/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:06/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/04/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndrew Hines Y
Saul M. PilchenNN
James P. SchaeferYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Amanda J. Winchester YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/21/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/29/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Saul Pilchen, Esquire, is hereby assigned to represent appellant as pro boo counsel in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) w/motion for appeal transcript attached (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/10/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (190pgs/Swaringer) 9/11/09 proc.
01/10/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (141pgs/Hunt) 9/18/09 proc. w/CD
01/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/25/2011RECORD INDEX
01/25/2011RECORD COPIES
01/25/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (defendent's motion to file affidavits under seal--filed 8/28/08, united states second ex parte motion for disclosure of grand jury testimony pursuant to superior court crim. r.6 (e)(3) (I) FILED 4/6/09)
02/15/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/ documents attached
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/22/2011APPENDIX (2 brown boxes) IN ROOM 047A ON SHELF BJ4
03/10/2011 On consideration of the motion of appellant to supplement the record with the lodged documents that were part of the record in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged documents will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for transmittal to this court as a supplemental record. (By: JAC)
03/21/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (Exhibits A-E)
03/24/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 40 days (no oppo).
04/01/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 3, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 14 days
05/17/2011APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE BRF IN EXCESS OF PAGES (no oppo)
05/17/2011RECEIVED - aple's brief
05/19/2011TMC - appellee's motion to extend briefing - motion to file (LODGED) brief in excess pages
06/01/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEES' MOTIONS ARE GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of APPELLEE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits panel as soon as the calendar permits. (RZTHNB)
06/01/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/01/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF until June 28, 2011 (no oppo)
06/09/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before June 28, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/22/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/28/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/12/2012FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Oberly, King
01/12/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
02/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
02/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to file a petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc until April 2, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
03/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 4/2/12.
03/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc until May 2, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
03/28/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 5/2/12.
05/02/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
08/13/2012FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
08/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File resopnse to appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
08/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion and appellee's response to appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc shall be filed on or before September 26, 2012.
09/17/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellee)
01/25/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
02/04/2013FiledMandate
10/09/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)