judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD E. ASHERMAN v. ROBYN R. ASHERMAN

Case Heading (S-09-0050)
Case Number:S-09-0050Case Docketed On:03/13/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:RICHARD E. ASHERMAN v. ROBYN R. ASHERMAN
Full Title:RICHARD E. ASHERMAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBYN R. ASHERMAN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard E. AshermanMichael Anthony LaBazzo
AppelleeRobyn R. AshermanJill Deann LaRance

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2009 WY 141
Citation:221 P.3d 302 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/13/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/13/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
04/24/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee Robyn R. RogersEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/12/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Michael A. LaBazzo on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
06/18/2009Brief - Appellant reply (improper, disregarded by court order of 7/21/09).BriefAppellant replyFinal
06/18/2009Motion - Other - to withdraw as counsel - Larry Jones, Colin Simpson.MotionOtherFinal
06/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Withdrawal of AttorneysEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/19/2009Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
06/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Richard E. AshermanEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/25/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/30/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/02/2009Motion - Strike - reply brief of appellant; and certificate of compliance with Rule 9.MotionStrikeFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Robyn Rogers' motion to strike reply brief of appellant Richard E. Asherman.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - certificate of complianceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/10/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Richard E. Asherman's opposition to motion to strike appellant's reply brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/21/2009Order - Striking - Order on motion to strike reply brief (brief is improper, court will disregard appellant's reply brief - reply brief not removed from system)OrderStrikingFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/17/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/03/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/03/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/10/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal