judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUGHES VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36363
Short Caption:HUGHES VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9504195Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/29/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Proper person Petition for the Assignment of a Judge, or in the Alternative Hear this Matter in this Court. 00-11150
06/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
07/06/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Danny L. Hughes- Albertsons money order-02-257477507.
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn2[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14090
09/06/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-15658
05/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion for Hearing or Rehearing. Because Hughes has not provided any basis for removing the judge assigned to his case and reassigning the case to some other judge, and because this court does not try lawsuits, we deny the motion for a hearing on the petition or for a rehearing of our August decision. 01-08254