judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00064-CV
02-94-00064-CV
03/10/1994
Divorce
Hammond, Rhonda Reece
Hammond, Jeff Favor
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/12/1995Mandate Issued
04/27/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/27/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/15/1995Order Entered
10/05/1994Submitted
10/05/1994Letter
10/05/1994Submission
10/03/1994Letter
09/01/1994Order Entered
08/25/1994Brief Filed
08/25/1994Case ready to be set
08/25/1994Other Document Filed
08/09/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/05/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/23/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/09/1994Brief Filed
05/09/1994Motion Filed
05/09/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/06/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/22/1994No Description Available.
03/10/1994No Description Available.
03/10/1994Submission
03/10/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hammond, Rhonda ReeceAppellantKeith Bowman
Hammond, Jeff FavorAppelleeRichard L. Turner
Jeff Favor Hammond
Trial Court Information
30th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Robert P. Brotherton
129,216-A