judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLORY A. UDOBOT V. SENTECH INCORPORATED

Case Information: 10-AA-1564
Short Caption:GLORY A. UDOBOT V. SENTECH INCORPORATEDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02180-10Filed Date:12/20/2010

Opening Event Date:12/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/27/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/17/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/23/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerGlory A. Udobot YPro SeN
RespondentSentech IncorporatedN
Rebecca N. Strandberg YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/20/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
12/20/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
12/28/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to December 20, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
12/28/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
02/08/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 28, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
02/24/2011APPEARANCE - Rebecca N. Strandberg as counsel for the respondent (Sentech Inc.)
06/01/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
06/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/22/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
06/22/2011APPENDIX
07/27/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
07/27/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/17/2012FiledSubmitted To Judges Glickman,Fisher,Beckwith
12/31/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Fisher, and Beckwith, Associate Judges.)
01/23/2013FiledMandate