judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BECKY ZALOUDEK v. KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK

Case Heading (S-09-0051)
Case Number:S-09-0051Case Docketed On:03/16/2009
Linked To: S-09-0016
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:BECKY ZALOUDEK v. KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK
Full Title:BECKY ZALOUDEK, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBecky ZaloudekRichard J. Mulligan
AppelleeKenneth J. Zaloudek Jr.William L. Combs

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/16/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/05/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
05/06/2009Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
05/22/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal