judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00262-CR
01-94-00262-CR
03/11/1994
Other Drug Possession
Campbell, Larry
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/1996Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/22/1995Motion to stay mandate disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/20/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/03/1995Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
11/03/1995Motion to recall mandate
10/11/1995Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
09/27/1995Case file received by higher Court or agency.
09/25/1995Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
09/07/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/18/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1995Submitted
06/06/1995Submission
06/06/1995Submitted
03/27/1995Submission
03/16/1995Brief Due
03/15/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/15/1995Case ready to be set
03/15/1995Case ready to be set
01/30/1995Brief Due
01/26/1995Motion strans disposedGrant motion
01/26/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/13/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/11/1995Motion for leave to file strans
01/05/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/05/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/22/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/13/1994Brief Due
12/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/28/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/27/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/14/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/01/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/24/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/28/1994Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
07/12/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
07/12/1994Statement of facts filed
05/26/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/16/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
03/11/1994Transcript filed
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - AppellantBruce Cameron Kaye
StateCriminal - AppellantTanya Elliott
StateCriminal - State of TexasSteven Greene
Trial Court Information
344th District Court
Chambers
7892
5 yrs tdc & 52,800 fine