judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00136-CV
03-94-00136-CV
03/11/1994
Administrative law
Tharwat M. Hamamcy, M.D.
Texas State Board of Medical Examiners and Attorney General
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/22/1996CASE STORED
03/22/1996Case returned from higher court
02/09/1996Appl Writ to Supreme Court denied
10/26/1995Case forwarded to higher court
10/20/1995Petition for writ of mandamus
09/14/1995Mt for ext of time to file Petition for Writ
08/30/1995Mandate Issued
07/12/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/20/1995Motion for rehearing filed
06/07/1995Correction filed
05/31/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1995Submitted
01/25/1995Submission
01/02/1995SUBMISSION RESET FOR LATER DATE
12/08/1994Submission
09/19/1994Oral argument request overruled by CourtOverruled
09/12/1994Letter received
07/25/1994Brief filed
07/25/1994Case ready to be set
07/13/1994Designation filed
06/30/1994Brief filed
06/30/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/29/1994Brief received, not filed
06/17/1994Response to Motion
06/16/1994Response requested (postcard)
06/13/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/01/1994Letter received
05/25/1994Response to Motion
05/13/1994Response to Motion
05/11/1994Response requested (postcard)
05/04/1994Follow up letter regarding unpaid fee
04/11/1994Response received
03/22/1994Response requested (postcard)
03/22/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/11/1994Transcript Filed
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/30/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hamamcy, M.D., Tharwat M.Appellant
Texas State Board Of Medical EAppelleeMs. Jennifer Gilchrist
Ms. Cynthia Villarreal-reyna
Attorney GeneralAppelleeMs. Ann Hartley
The Honorable Dan Morales
Mr. Stuart W. Bowen Jr.
Hamamcy, M.D., tharwat M.AppellantTharwat M. Hamamcy, M.d.
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable Margaret A. Cooper
93-10505