judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00135-CV
03-94-00135-CV
03/11/1994
Habeas Corpus Writ
Bobby D. Humphries
Chemical Financial Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/23/1994Mandate Issued
09/21/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
09/09/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/05/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/30/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedOverruled
06/28/1994Brief filed
06/28/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/24/1994Brief received, not filed
06/13/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/11/1994Response to Motion
04/25/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/11/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/11/1994Transcript Filed
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/23/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Humphries, Bobby D.AppellantMr. Darwin McKee
Chemical Financial CorporationAppelleeMr. Martin T. Hougham
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable F. Scott McCown
93-05306