judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00386-CR
05-94-00386-CR
03/11/1994
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Hart, Dan
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/30/1994Transcript Filed
03/11/1994Notice Sent
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/01/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
12/03/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/04/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F93-40817-J
10 yrs TDC